EP0174366 - T-CELL RECEPTOR-SPECIFIC FOR ANTIGEN POLYPEPTIDES AND RELATED POLYNUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Encina Hall 105 Stanford University Stanford, California 94305-1850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Encina 105 Stanford University Stanford California 94305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Mark, M. 422 Foxborough Drive Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 02 /
HEDRICK, Stephen, M. 1031 Santa Queta Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [1986/12] | Representative(s) | Silveston, Judith, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | Silveston, Judith, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1986/12] | Harrison, David Christopher MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85901706.3 | 28.02.1985 | [1986/12] | WO1985US00367 | Priority number, date | US19840585333 | 01.03.1984 Original published format: US 585333 | US19840663809 | 22.10.1984 Original published format: US 663809 | [1986/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503947 | Date: | 12.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0174366 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0174366 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
C07K14/82 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/12] | C12P19/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/12] | Title | German: | T-ZELLENREZEPTOR, SPEZIFISCH FÜR ANTIGENPOLYPEPTIDE UND VERWANDTE POLYNUKLEOTIDE | [1986/12] | English: | T-CELL RECEPTOR-SPECIFIC FOR ANTIGEN POLYPEPTIDES AND RELATED POLYNUCLEOTIDES | [1986/12] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE LYMPHOCYTE SPECIFIQUE POUR DES POLYPEPTIDES D'ANTIGENES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES APPARENTES | [1986/12] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1985 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1985 | Search fee paid | 21.11.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 14.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 30.08.1991 | Appeal received No. T0001/92 | 11.09.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.04.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | EP93112159.4 / EP0570027 | EP94101806.1 / EP0609901 | EP98123060.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 12.01.1999 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/47] | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | 11.11.1992 | Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46] | 30.12.1992 | Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [1992/53] | 06.01.1993 | Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02] | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   07.12.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0149548 (ONTARIO CANCER INST [CA]); | [E]EP0180878 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) | [X] - SCIENCE, vol. 221, 23rd September 1983, pages 1278-1279; J.L. MARX: "Likely T cell receptor gene cloned" | [X] - IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, vol. 4, no. 11, November 1983, pages 299-301; J.A. BERZOFSKY: "Promising clues to reception genes and molecules" | [XP] - NATURE, vol. 308, 8th March 1984, pages 149-153; S.M. HEDRICK et al.: "Isolation of cDNA clones encoding T cell-specific membrane-associated proteins" | [XP] - NATURE, vol. 312, 1st November 1984, pages 31-35; Y. CHIEN et al.: "A third type of murine T-cell receptor gene" | International search | [XP] - EMBO Journal, 3(10), 1984, COLLINS et al, "A Human T-Cell Antigen Receptor B Chain Gene Maps to Chromosone 7" p. 2347-9 | [XP] - Cell, 37, June 1984, SIU et al "The Human T Cell Antigen Receptor is Encoded by Variable, Diversity, and Joining Gene Segments that Rearange to Generate a Complete V Gene" p. 393-401 | [X] - Journal of Experimental Medicine, 158, 1983, KRONENBERG et al, "The T Cell Hybrindomas do not Contain Delectable Heavy Chain Variable Gene Transcripts" p. 210-227 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 100: 151950M HEDRICK et al, "Isolation of cDNA Clones Encoding T-Cell Specific Membrane Associated Protein" Nature 308 p. 149 53. | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS. Vol. 100; 204 488h YANAGI et al, "A Human T Cell Specific cDNA Clone Encodes A Protein Having Extensive Homology to Immunoglobulin Chians", Nature 308 p.145-9 | [A] - Cell, 34, October 1983, ACUTO et al, "The Human T Cell Receptor: Appearance in Ontogeny and Biochemical Relationship of alpha and beta Subunits on IL-2 Dependant Clones and T Cell Tumors "p 717-726 | [A] - Journal of Experimental Medicine, 152, December 1980, KRONENBERG et al, "Helper and Killer T Cells do not Express B Cell Immunoglobulin Joining and Constant Region Gene Segments" p. 1745-61 | [A] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, 80, July 1983, REINHERZ et al, "Comparison of T 3-Associated 49 and 43 Kilodalton Cell Surface Molecules on Individual Human T-Cell Clones: Evidence for Peptide Variability in T-Cell Receptor Structures" p. 4104-8 | [A] - Cell, 34(10), October 1983, KAPPLER et al, "The Mouse T Cell Receptor: Comparison of MHC-Restricted Receptors on Two T Cell Hybridomas" p727-37 | [A] - Nature, 303, 30 June 1983, MEUER et al, "Evidence for the T3-Associated 90K Heterodimer as the T-Cell Antigen Receptor" p808-810 | Examination | - EMBO Journal, 3(10), 1984, Collins et al.:"A Human T-Cell Antigen Receptor BChain Gene Maps to Chromosone 7", pp. 2347-2349 | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 100, 204488h, Yanagi et al.:"A human T cell-specific cDNA clone encodes a protein having extensive homology to immunoglobulin chains" | - Journal of Experimental Medicine, 152, December 1980, Kronenberg et al.:"Helper and killer T cells do not express B cell immunoglobulin joining and constant region gene segments", pp. 1745-1761 | - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, 80, July 1983, Reinherz et al.:"Comparison of T 3-associated 49 and 43 kilodalton cell surface molecules on individual human T-cell clones: evidence for peptide variability in T-cell receptor structures", pp. 4104-4108 | - Cell, 34(10), October 1983, Kappler et al.:"The mouse T cell receptor: comparison of MHC-restricted receptors on two T cell hybridomas", pp. 727-737 |