EP0181344 - METHOD OF TRANSFERRING IMPURITIES BETWEEN DIFFERENTLY DOPED SEMICONDUCTOR REGIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1986/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Kye, Hwan 216 North Broad Street Allentown, PA 18104 / US | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 85901825.1 | 25.03.1985 | [1986/21] | WO1985US00502 | Priority number, date | US19840597924 | 09.04.1984 Original published format: US 597924 | [1986/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504759 | Date: | 24.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181344 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181344 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/22, H01L21/225, H01L21/74 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
H01L21/28512 (EP,US);
H01L21/2257 (EP,US);
Y10S148/035 (EP,US);
Y10S438/919 (EP,US);
Y10S438/923 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERFÜHREN VON FREMDSTOFFEN ZWISCHEN UNTERSCHIEDLICH DOTIERTEN HALBLEITERZONEN | [1988/10] | English: | METHOD OF TRANSFERRING IMPURITIES BETWEEN DIFFERENTLY DOPED SEMICONDUCTOR REGIONS | [1986/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT D'IMPURETES ENTRE DES REGIONS SEMI-CONDUCTRICES A DOPAGE DIFFERENT | [1986/21] |
Former [1986/21] | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERFÜHREN VON VERUNREINIGUNGEN ZWISCHEN UNTERSCHIEDLICH DOTIERTEN HALBLEITERGEBIETEN | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1985 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 20.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2255107 [ ] (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK); | EP0009910 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [A] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 24, No. 6, November 1981 (New York, US) S. DASH et al.: "Method to Fabricate Polysilicon or Polycide Buried Contacts to Diffused lines in a Mosfet", pages 2863-2866 | [A] - Journal of Applied Physics, Vol. 49, No. 12, December 1978 (New York, US) M. WITTMER et al.: "The Redistribution of Implanted Dopants after Metalsilicide Formation", pages 5827-5834 |