EP0179109 - TRANSDUCER FOR MAGNETIC INDUCTIVE FLOW METERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.07.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHEOMETRON AG Schützenmattstrasse 43 4003 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | For all designated states RHEOMETRON AG Schützenmattstrasse 43 CH-4003 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER POL, Ronald Victor Hugostraat 27 NL-5924 AK Venlo / NL | [1986/18] | Representative(s) | Ackmann, Günther Ackmann Menges Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | Ackmann, Günther ACKMANN & MENGES Patentanwälte Postfach 10 01 01 D-47001 Duisburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85902028.1 | 19.04.1985 | [1986/18] | WO1985EP00176 | Priority number, date | DE19843415538 | 26.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3415538 | [1986/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504954 | Date: | 07.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179109 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179109 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/58 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
G01F1/584 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/18] | Title | German: | MESSWERTAUFNEHMER FÜR MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVE DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄTE | [1988/26] | English: | TRANSDUCER FOR MAGNETIC INDUCTIVE FLOW METERS | [1986/18] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR POUR DEBIMETRES MAGNETIQUES INDUCTIFS | [1986/18] |
Former [1986/18] | MESSWERTAUFNEHMER FÜR MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVE DURCHLFLUSSMESSGERÄTE | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.1985 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1985 | Examination requested [1986/18] | 18.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.03.1989
09.05.1989
ADMISSIBLE Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 CH-4153 Reinach BL 1 / CH | [1989/21] | 11.05.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.07.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.07.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 05.10.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 01.04.1990 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1990/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.06.1988 | SE | 30.06.1988 | AT | 19.04.1989 | LU | 30.04.1989 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 29.06.1988 | |
CH | 29.06.1988 | ||
LI | 29.06.1988 | ||
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
AT | 19.04.1989 | ||
LU | 30.04.1989 | ||
Former [1991/08] | BE | 29.06.1988 | |
CH | 29.06.1988 | ||
LI | 29.06.1988 | ||
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
AT | 19.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/52] | BE | 29.06.1988 | |
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
AT | 19.04.1989 | ||
Former [1989/23] | BE | 29.06.1988 | |
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 29.06.1988 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP5975118 ; | DE2950039 [ ] (KROHNE MESSTECHNIK KG [DE]); | DE1773773 [ ] (ECKARDT AG J) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 8, No. 183, page (P-196) (162) Derwent Publications, London (GB) & JP, A, 5975118 (Yokogawa Hokushin Denki K.K.) 27 April 1984, see the whole Abstract, & JP5975118 A 19840427 |