EP0178317 - TRANSFORMABLE AND DISMOUNTABLE BILLIARD-TABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1986 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.1986 [1986/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEBART, Michel Campagne sur Arize F-09350 Daumazan / FR | [1986/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/17] | Application number, filing date | 85902056.2 | 24.04.1985 | [1986/17] | WO1985FR00095 | Priority number, date | FR19840006829 | 27.04.1984 Original published format: FR 8406829 | [1986/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8505045 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178317 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63D15/04 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
A63D15/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/17] | Title | German: | ZERLEGBARE UND UMWANDELBARE BILLARDTISCHE | [1986/17] | English: | TRANSFORMABLE AND DISMOUNTABLE BILLIARD-TABLES | [1986/17] | French: | TABLES DE BILLIARD TRANSFORMABLES ET DEMONTABLES | [1986/17] | File destroyed: | 17.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 01.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/50] | 13.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1986/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.01.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.05.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US1549441 [ ]; | DE579100 [ ]; | US1979177 [ ]; | GB1262135 [ ]; | US1399864 [ ]; | US2445575 [ ]; | US4336936 [ ]; | FR2550458 [ ] |