EP0176589 - NORTH-SOUTH PINCUSHION CORRECTED DEFLECTION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states RCA CORPORATION CN 5312 Princeton, NJ 08540-0028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAFERL, Peter, Eduard Feldblumenstrasse 20 CH-8134 Adliswil / CH | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald RCA International Limited Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | [1986/34] |
Former [1986/15] | Pratt, Richard Wilson c/o RCA International Limited Norfolk House 31 St. James's Square London, SW1Y 4JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 85902220.4 | 04.04.1985 | [1986/15] | WO1985US00571 | Priority number, date | GB19840008693 | 04.04.1984 Original published format: GB 8408693 | GB19840014947 | 12.06.1984 Original published format: GB 8414947 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504756 | Date: | 24.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176589 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176589 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.10.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/233, H01J29/56 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
H04N3/233 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/15] | H01J29/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | ABLENKSCHALTUNG MIT KORREKTION DER N-S KISSENVERZERRUNG | [1986/15] | English: | NORTH-SOUTH PINCUSHION CORRECTED DEFLECTION CIRCUIT | [1986/15] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DEVIATION COMPORTANT UNE CORRECTION DE LA DISTORSION EN COUSSINET NORD-SUD | [1986/15] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/41: Divisional application 88201972 filed on 09.09.88 | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1985 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1985 | Search fee paid | 26.11.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 11.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88201972.2 / EP0308018 | EP92116531.2 / EP0522602 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4041354 (HAFERL PETER EDUARD) |