EP0185767 - FILM FOR MACHINING WAFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 28.09.1993 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.1993 | Opposition rejected | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARIMATSU, Osamu 5, Takiharucho Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 457-91 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Michiyasu 68, Hoshikawa Kuwana-shi Mie 511 / JP | 03 /
KOMATSU, Kazuyoshi 5, Takiharucho Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 457-91 / JP | 04 /
SHIBATA, Yasuhiro 12, Matsushitacho 1-chome Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 457-91 / JP | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 85902642.9 | 23.05.1985 | [1986/27] | WO1985JP00284 | Priority number, date | JP19840107539 | 29.05.1984 Original published format: JP 10753984 | JP19840164328 | 07.08.1984 Original published format: JP 16432884 | [1986/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8505734 | Date: | 19.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185767 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185767 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.12.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/304, H01L21/78, B24B37/00 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
H01L21/02013 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
B24B37/30 (EP,US);
C09J7/385 (EP,US);
H01L21/6836 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1089 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1452 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1462 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/27] | Title | German: | FILM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HALBLEITERWAFFELN | [1986/27] | English: | FILM FOR MACHINING WAFERS | [1986/27] | French: | FILM D'USINAGE DE TRANCHES DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [1986/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.1986 | Translation filed | 04.02.1986 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1986 | Search fee paid | 04.02.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 08.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.1991
12.12.1991
ADMISSIBLE The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd 6-1, 2-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP Opponent's representative Hansen, Bernd Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.1991
12.12.1991
ADMISSIBLE The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd 6-1, 2-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP Opponent's representative Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | 17.12.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.02.1993 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/46] | 02.02.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.04.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.04.1993 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5737836 ; | [A]JPS5745929 ; | [A]JPS5922329 ; | [AP]JPS59103342 ; | [A]US3453783 (QUEEN WILLIAM D); | [X]DE2808083 (SILTEC CORP); | [X]US4395451 (ALTHOUSE VICTOR E [US]); | [AP]US4512113 (BUDINGER WILLIAM D [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820617), vol. 006, no. 107, Database accession no. (E - 113)<985>, & JP57037836 A 19820302 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820703), vol. 006, no. 119, Database accession no. (E - 116)<997>, & JP57045929 A 19820316 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840519), vol. 008, no. 107, Database accession no. (E - 245)<1544>, & JP59022329 A 19840204 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841004), vol. 008, no. 217, Database accession no. (E - 270)<1654>, & JP59103342 A 19840614 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) | International search | [A]JPS50340B ; | [A]JPS5737836 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS5745929 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [P]JPS6057642 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO) | Examination | JPS50340B |