EP0185707 - MOBILE, OFFSHORE, JACK-UP, MARINE PLATFORM ADJUSTABLE FOR SLOPING SEAFLOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.09.1990 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETHLEHEM STEEL CORPORATION 701 East Third Street Bethlehem Pennsylvania 18016 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states Bethlehem Steel Corporation 701 East Third Street Bethlehem Pennsylvania 18016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEELE, James, Edward 630 Bancroft Drive Beaumont, TX 77706 / US | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85902893.8 | 24.05.1985 | [1986/27] | WO1985US00995 | Priority number, date | US19840614585 | 29.05.1984 Original published format: US 614585 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8505645 | Date: | 19.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185707 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E02B17/08 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
E02B17/021 (EP,US);
E02B17/08 (KR);
E02B17/027 (EP,US);
E02B17/0809 (EP,US);
E02B17/0872 (EP,US);
E02B2017/006 (EP,US);
E02B2017/0086 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHE, HÖHENVERSTELLBARE MEERESPLATTFORM, WELCHE FÜR ABFALLENDEN MEERESBODEN REGELBAR IST | [1986/27] | English: | MOBILE, OFFSHORE, JACK-UP, MARINE PLATFORM ADJUSTABLE FOR SLOPING SEAFLOOR | [1986/27] | French: | PLATE-FORME DE FORAGE DE HAUTE MER, MOBILE, AUTO-ELEVATRICE ET REGLABLE EN FONCTION DE LA PENTE DU FOND DE LA MER | [1986/27] | File destroyed: | 17.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1986 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1986 | Search fee paid | 24.02.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 23.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/44] | 15.06.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2210408 [ ] (HENRY CHARLES L); | US3967458 [ ] (SCALES RALPH E); | GB2026573 [ ] (PETROLEO BRASILEIRO SA) | International search | [A]US2352370 (CARRUTHERS ROBERT L); | [A]AT209196B (HOFER HANS); | [A]US2953904 (CHRISTENSON LOWELL B); | [A]US2995900 (HUNSUCKER WILLIAM A); | [A]US3289419 (MCGOWEN JR HAROLD E); | [A]US3290007 (YEILDING RALPH D); | [A]DE2019985 (SALZGITTER MASCHINEN AG); | [A]US3927535 (GIBLON ROBERT P); | [A]US4224005 (DYSARZ EDWARD D); | [A]US4255069 (YIELDING RALPH D); | [A]US4445805 (RAY DONALD R [US], et al) |