EP0221059 - PILE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOERKAMP, Gerrit Gohannes 15 Streatley Road Rivervale, W.A. 6103 / AU | For all designated states LIEBREGTS, Johannus Adrianus Antonius 78 Broun Avenue Embleton, W.A. 6062 / AU | [1987/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIEBREGTS, Johannus, Adrianus, Antonius 78 Broun Avenue Embleton, W.A.6062 / AU | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Cardwell, Stuart Martin, et al Roystons Tower Building Water Street Liverpool, L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | Cardwell, Stuart Martin, et al Roystons Tower Building Water Street Liverpool, Merseyside L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85902936.5 | 13.06.1985 | [1987/20] | WO1985AU00128 | Priority number, date | AU19840005492 | 13.06.1984 Original published format: AU 549284 | [1987/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600098 | Date: | 03.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221059 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.01.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D05C15/20, D05C15/26 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
D05C15/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/20] | Title | German: | POLBILDUNGSSYSTEM | [1987/20] | English: | PILE FORMING APPARATUS | [1987/20] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION DE POILS | [1987/20] | File destroyed: | 17.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1986 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1986 | Search fee paid | 10.12.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 16.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 21.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/41] | 09.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.12.1986 | M02   Fee paid on   30.01.1987 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.1987 | 30.06.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.1988 | 30.06.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.1989 | 02.07.1990 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3247814 ; | [Y]FR2343073 ; | [Y]CH124333 ; | [Y]US3752095 ; | [A]US2804835 ; | [Y]US2726612 ; | [Y]FR1536287 ; | [Y]DE2906095 ; | [Y]FR1587606 ; | [Y]GB1238846 ; | [Y]US2528392 ; | [Y]CH298477 ; | [Y]FR2249987 | International search | [X]US3722434 ; | [X]US3568614 ; | [X]GB1323735 ; | [X]GB1297424 ; | [X]GB1144613 ; | [X]GB1125007 ; | [X]US4048930 ; | [X]US3919953 ; | [X]US3919952 ; | [X]US3356048 ; | [X]US3286670 ; | [X]GB1195684 |