EP0185735 - DIGITAL ACCELEROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND DATA CONTROL, INC. Overlake Industrial Park Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [1986/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MacGUGAN, Douglas, Campbell 24997 S.E. 155th Place Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | 02 /
LEONARDSON, Ronald, B. 4200 - 270th Avenue, N.E. Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 03 /
SAND, William, W. 12925 N.E. 147th Place Kirkland, WA 98034 / US | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 85903135.3 | 07.06.1985 | [1986/27] | WO1985US01078 | Priority number, date | US19840620441 | 14.06.1984 Original published format: US 620441 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600144 | Date: | 03.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185735 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/08 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
G01P1/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, LI, NL, SE [1986/52] |
Former [1986/27] | BE, CH, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | DIGITALER BESCHLEUNIGUNGSMETER | [1986/27] | English: | DIGITAL ACCELEROMETER | [1986/27] | French: | ACCELEROMETRE NUMERIQUE | [1986/27] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1986 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1986 | Search fee paid | 11.02.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 27.05.1986 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 20.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/52] | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.03.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4336718 (WASHBURN JOHN R) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 10, no. 3, August 1967, pages 207-208, New York, US; R.M. KLOEPPER et al.: "Force sensor" | International search | [Y]US3039177 (BURDETT RHODES B); | [Y]US3105869 (BRANCH GERALD L, et al); | [X]US3643513 (WEAVER PRESTON R); | [Y]US3873889 (LEYBA MANUEL R); | [Y]US4102202 (FERRISS LINCOLN STARK); | [X]US4114450 (SHULMAN LAWRENCE M, et al); | [Y]US4360858 (FAHLING WALDO C) |