EP0229049 - PREPARATION OF CHLORINATED POLYOLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKERS, James, B., Jr. 9945 Hawthorn Baton Rouge, LA 70809 / US | 02 /
LENG, Douglas, E. 1714 Sylvan Lane Midland, MI 48640 / US | 03 /
NORMAND, Randall, J. 512 Senator Gay Blvd. Plaquemine, LA 70764 / US | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85903143.7 | 10.06.1985 | [1987/30] | WO1985US01095 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8607366 | Date: | 18.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229049 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229049 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/22 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
C08F8/22 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/22, C08F10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG CHLORIERTER POLYOLEFINE | [1987/30] | English: | PREPARATION OF CHLORINATED POLYOLEFINS | [1987/30] | French: | PREPARATION DE POLYOLEFINES CHLOREES | [1987/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.1987 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.1987 | Search fee paid | 19.01.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 18.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3071569 (HOERGER FRED D); | [A]GB1113510 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]US3758450 (MARGRAVE J, et al) | International search | [A]US57285 ; | [X]US326066 ; | [X]US1111788 (EWING CLAUDE WILSON [US]); | [A]US1402318 (RODEBUSH WORTH H); | [A]US2356628 (GERHARD STALMANN GEORG PIETER); | [X]GB709919 (PETER LOHENZ SHANTA); | [X]CA749832 (UNILEVER LTD); | [A]US3936430 (SCHOEN LOWHARDT A A, et al) |