EP0185741 - STRUCTURED LATEX PARTICLES WHICH ARE FILM FORMING AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUSCHTEIN, Fabio, B. 7 Robin Court Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
JAHN, Robert, G. 2046 Sharp Street Saginaw, MI 48602 / US | 03 /
WITTBRODT, Edwin, L. 301 Ruth Street Auburn, MI 48611 / US | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 85903169.2 | 21.06.1985 | [1986/27] | WO1985US01163 | Priority number, date | US19840624329 | 25.06.1984 Original published format: US 624329 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600325 | Date: | 16.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185741 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185741 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.01.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/00, C08F2/16, C08K3/20, C08K5/52 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
C08F285/00 (EP,US);
C08F291/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F291/00, C08F220/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | FILMBILDENDE STRUKTURIERTE LATEXTEILCHEN UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1986/27] | English: | STRUCTURED LATEX PARTICLES WHICH ARE FILM FORMING AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [1986/27] | French: | PARTICULES DE LATEX STRUCTURE FILMOGENES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1986/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1986 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1986 | Search fee paid | 21.02.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4156669 (LEE DO I [US]); | [Y]US3562235 (RYAN CHARLES F); | [Y]US3745136 (HUHN H, et al); | [A]US4002801 (KNECHTGES DONALD P, et al); | [A]US3379665 (LYON HERBERT R, et al); | [A]US4497917 (UPSON DONALD A [US], et al); | [A]US3657172 (GALLAGHER RUTH E, et al); | [A]US3254044 (GUNDERMAN ROLAND E, et al) |