EP0214141 - FOLDABLE LETTER FOR THE DISPATCHING THEREOF BY POST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.1989 [1989/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BÜCHLER-DOPHEIDE, Ingrid Waldstrasse 86 D-6640 Merzig / DE | [1987/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Kühnemann, Klaus Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Kühnemann Dr.-Ing. Karl-Ernst Müller Sonderburgstrasse 36 D-4000 Düsseldorf 11 / DE | [1987/12] | Application number, filing date | 85903207.0 | 20.06.1985 | [1987/12] | WO1985DE00209 | Priority number, date | DE19843422771 | 20.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3422771 | DE19853508116 | 07.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3508116 | [1987/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600276 | Date: | 16.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0214141 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65D27/00, B65D27/34, B65D75/14 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
B42D15/08 (EP,US);
B65D27/34 (EP,US);
B65D75/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | FALTBRIEF ZUR BEFÖRDERUNG MIT DER POST | [1987/12] | English: | FOLDABLE LETTER FOR THE DISPATCHING THEREOF BY POST | [1987/12] | French: | LETTRE PLIABLE POUR SON ACHEMINEMENT PAR LA POSTE | [1987/12] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1986 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 20.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 31.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/26] | 31.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.1987 | 30.06.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1238882 [ ] (LINCRUSTA); | GB553816 [ ] (HORACE JAMES CHAPMAN); | FR1157234 [ ]; | FR2156418 [ ] (RATHIER BERNARD); | US1760106 [ ] (BEACH RICHARD W); | FR474636 [ ] (CYRO MASETTI [BR], et al); | US1850883 [ ] (KEHL GEORGE S) |