EP0187798 - PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF ALDOSIDES OR OLIGOALDOSIDES OF ALKYL, CYCLOALKYL OR ALKENYL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/30] | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF ALDOSIDES OR POLYALDOSIDES OF ALKYL, CYCLOALKYL OR ALKENYL | ||
[1988/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.1989 [1989/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEGHIN-SAY SOCIETE ANONYME F-59239 Thumeries / FR | [1989/35] |
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states BEGHIN-SAY SA F-59239 Thumeries / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEFAYE, Jacques 202, chemin du Vercors F-38330 Saint Dismier / FR | 02 /
WONG, Emile 117, cours Jean Jaurès F-38000 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
PEDERSEN, Christian Bredesvinget 18 DK-2830 Virum / DK | 04 /
CHEDIN, Jean 1ter, rue Mornay F-75004 Paris / FR | 05 /
BOUCHU, Alain 11, av. R. Rosselini F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [1986/30] | Application number, filing date | 85903310.2 | 18.07.1985 | [1986/30] | WO1985FR00197 | Priority number, date | FR19840011466 | 19.07.1984 Original published format: FR 8411466 | [1986/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600906 | Date: | 13.02.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0187798 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0187798 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04, C07H15/207, C07H15/10 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKYL, CYCLOALKYL ODER ALKENYL ALDOSIDEN ODER OLIGOALIDOSIDEN | [1988/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF ALDOSIDES OR OLIGOALDOSIDES OF ALKYL, CYCLOALKYL OR ALKENYL | [1988/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE D'ALDOSIDES OU D'OLIGOALDOSIDES D'ALKYLE, DE CYCLOALKYLE OU D'ALCENYLE | [1988/48] |
Former [1986/30] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKYL, CYCLOALKYL ODER ALKENYL ALDOSIDEN ODER POLYALDOSIDEN | ||
Former [1986/30] | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF ALDOSIDES OR POLYALDOSIDES OF ALKYL, CYCLOALKYL OR ALKENYL | ||
Former [1986/30] | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE D'ALDOSIDES OU DE POLYALDOSIDES D'ALKYLE, DE CYCLOALKYLE OU D'ALCENYLE | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.1986 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 25.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2390507 [ ] (CANTOR SIDNEY M); | DE1905523 [ ] (ATLAS CHEM IND); | EP0106522 [ ] (KETTERING FOUND CHARLES F [US]) | [Y] - Carbohydrate Research, Volume 110, 1982, Elsevier Scientific Publishing Company, (Amsterdam, NL) J. DEFAYE et al.: "The Behaviour of Cellulose, Amylose, and beta-D-Xylan towards Anhydrous Hydrogen Fluoride", pages 217-227 see pages 217-219 (cited in the application) | Examination | - "The Carbohydrates (Chemistry and Biochemistry)" Tome IA (1972), page 181 |