EP0188508 - APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE RESPIRATORY BEHAVIOUR OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.1990 [1990/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PELTZER, Erna Tuinstraat 73 3732 VK De Bilt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states PELTZER, Erna Tuinstraat 73 NL-3732 VK De Bilt / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | van der Beek, George F., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | van der Beek, George Frans, Ir., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1986/31] | van der Beek, George Frans Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 85903406.8 | 16.07.1985 | [1986/31] | WO1985NL00030 | Priority number, date | NL19840002290 | 19.07.1984 Original published format: NL 8402290 | NL19850000314 | 05.02.1985 Original published format: NL 8500314 | [1986/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600793 | Date: | 13.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0188508 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/08, A61B5/10, A61H23/04, A61H31/00 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
A61B5/08 (EP);
A61B5/1135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER ATEMTÄTIGKEIT EINES PATIENTEN | [1986/31] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE RESPIRATORY BEHAVIOUR OF A PATIENT | [1986/31] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LE COMPORTEMENT RESPIRATOIRE D'UN PATIENT | [1986/31] | File destroyed: | 17.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1986 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 04.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/18] | 27.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.1988 | 31.07.1989 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US1619005 [ ]; | US3483861 [ ]; | GB2082328 [ ]; | DE2911258 [ ]; | US3866604 [ ]; | US4319581 [ ]; | US3908640 [ ]; | GB1158124 [ ]; | DE1933472 [ ]; | US4424806 [ ]; | US3683655 [ ] | [A] - IRE Transactions (US) on Bio-Medical Electronics (US), Volume BME-8, Nr. 3, July 1961, New York, (US) pages 197+198 P. STONER et al.: "A Miniaturized Pneumograph Monitor", see the whole article |