EP0182902 - CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1988 [1988/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA-LAVAL AB Box 500 147 00 Tumba / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states ALFA-LAVAL AB Box 500 S-147 00 Tumba / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINTENSTEDT, Kjell Sjöängsvägen 16 S-132 00 Nacka / SE | 02 /
FÖLDHAZY, Zoltan Skrävstavägen 38 S-147 00 Tumba / SE | 03 /
FORSBERG, Björn Stumpedyssevej 30 KB DK-2970 Hörsholm / DK | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85903420.9 | 13.06.1985 | [1986/23] | WO1985SE00249 | Priority number, date | SE19840003182 | 14.06.1984 Original published format: SE 8403182 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600029 | Date: | 03.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0182902 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182902 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B04B7/08 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
B04B1/20 (EP,US);
B04B7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/23] | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGAL-TRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1986/23] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR | [1986/23] | French: | SEPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE | [1986/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1986 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed | Examination | - none |