|
03.07.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.1994 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1994 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.1994 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1994 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.02.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.12.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.1993 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1991 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
17.12.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.10.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.1990 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1990 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.01.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.1990 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1989 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1988 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1988 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1988 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.1988 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1988 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1988 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.1988 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.1988 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.07.1986 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1986 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1986 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1986 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1986 |
Deficiencies in translation of international application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.1986 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.1986 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.1986 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.1986 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1986 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1986 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.1986 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
124 |
|
16.01.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
29.07.1985 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1985 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |