EP0191796 - SURFACE COVERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DESIGNAFLOOR LTD. 2 Sway Road Morriston Swansea West Glamorgan SA6 6HT / GB | [1986/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWEN, Phillip 20, The Paddock, West Cross Swansea, West Glamorgan / GB | 02 /
WALTERS, Ian, David 33 Melyn Street Glyncorrwg West Glamorgan SA1 3AT / GB | [2007/32] |
Former [1986/35] | 01 /
OWEN, Phillip 72 Pentyla Prot Talbot West Glamorgan SA12 8AD / GB | ||
02 /
WALTERS, Ian, David 33 Melyn Street Glyncorrwg West Glamorgan SA1 3AT / GB | Representative(s) | Austin, Hedley William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | Austin, Hedley William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Swansea West Glamorgan SA1 5ED / GB | ||
Former [1986/35] | Austin, Hedley William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Swansea West Glamorgan SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 85903857.2 | 02.08.1985 | [1986/35] | WO1985GB00343 | Priority number, date | GB19840019899 | 03.08.1984 Original published format: GB 8419899 | GB19840021019 | 17.08.1984 Original published format: GB 8421019 | GB19850006592 | 14.03.1985 Original published format: GB 8506592 | [1986/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601247 | Date: | 27.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0191796 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, A47G27/02 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
E04F15/02 (EP);
A47G27/0475 (EP);
A47G27/0481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1986/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR FLÄCHENVERKLEIDUNG | [1986/35] | English: | SURFACE COVERING SYSTEM | [1986/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE REVETEMENT DE SURFACES | [1986/35] | File destroyed: | 18.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.1986 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 19.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/18] | 26.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1599030 [ ]; | FR1584059 [ ]; | US3862874 [ ]; | FR1463584 [ ] |