EP0190290 - RECUPERATIVE FURNACE WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN COMBUSTION, INC. 2985 Gateway Drive Norcross, GA 30071 / US | [1986/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GITMAN, Grigory, Michael 3642 Frederica Road Duluth, GA 30136 / US | [1986/33] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/33] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85904057.8 | 12.08.1985 | [1986/33] | WO1985US01538 | Priority number, date | US19840642075 | 16.08.1984 Original published format: US 642075 | [1986/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601279 | Date: | 27.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0190290 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F23M3/00 | [1986/33] | CPC: |
F27D1/00 (EP,US);
F23M3/00 (KR);
F23L15/04 (EP,US);
F23M5/00 (EP,US);
F27D17/004 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US);
Y02P80/15 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/33] | Title | German: | OFENWAND MIT INTEGRIERTEM REKUPERATOR | [1986/33] | English: | RECUPERATIVE FURNACE WALL | [1986/33] | French: | PAROI RECUPERATRICE POUR FOURNEAUX | [1986/33] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1986 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1986 | Search fee paid | 30.04.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 11.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2004994 (HOTWORK DEV CO) | International search | [X]US1358330 (ROCKWELL WALTER S); | [X]SU382903 ; | [A]US4038022 (BLACKMAN CALVIN C); | [A]GB815643 (ALEC JOSEPH SKINNER) |