EP0190366 - BOILER CAPABLE OF RECOVERING WASTE HEAT AND HAVING DENITRATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Hitachi Engineering Co., Ltd. 2-1, Saiwai-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/33] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Engineering Co., Ltd. 2-1, Saiwai-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAI, Eiji 13-1, Ose-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317 / JP | 02 /
KURIBAYASHI, Testuzo 21-16, Nishinarusawa-cho 4-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | [1986/33] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/33] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85904152.7 | 23.08.1985 | [1986/33] | WO1985JP00466 | Priority number, date | JP19840175030 | 24.08.1984 Original published format: JP 17503084 | [1986/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601579 | Date: | 13.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0190366 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0190366 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/18 | [1986/33] | CPC: |
F23J15/006 (EP,US);
B01D53/8631 (EP,US);
F01K23/106 (EP,US);
F22B37/008 (EP,US);
F23J2219/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/33] | Title | German: | ABHITZEKESSEL MIT DENITRIERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [1989/20] | English: | BOILER CAPABLE OF RECOVERING WASTE HEAT AND HAVING DENITRATION DEVICES | [1986/33] | French: | CHAUDIERE POUVANT RECUPERER LA CHALEUR PERDUE ET POSSEDANT DES DISPOSITIFS DE DENITRURATION | [1986/33] |
Former [1986/33] | OFEN ZUR WIEDERGEWINNUNG DER RESTWÄRME UND DENITRIERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1985 | Translation filed | 20.12.1985 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1985 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 22.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4087250 (LAUE KARL HEINRICH, et al); | [AD]GB2012927 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]GB2082085 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]FR2539216 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) | International search | [Y]JPS4936881B ; | [Y]JPS51112483 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPS5241701 (HITACHI LTD) |