EP0190318 - MULTI-WAY VALVE FOR CHANGING THE FLOW DIRECTION OF GASEOUS OR LIQUID MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESROC GmbH Vertrieb technischer Produkte Hallerhüttenstrasse 6 D-8500 Nürnberg 40 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/33] | For all designated states MESROC GmbH Vertrieb technischer Produkte Hallerhüttenstrasse 6 D-8500 Nürnberg 40 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERTEN, Fritz Brückkanalstrasse 25 D-8501 Schwarzenbruck / DE | [1986/33] | Application number, filing date | 85904226.9 | 21.08.1985 | [1986/33] | WO1985DE00282 | Priority number, date | DE19843430860 | 22.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430860 | [1986/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601583 | Date: | 13.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0190318 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F28G1/12, F16K11/085 | [1986/33] | CPC: |
F28G1/125 (EP);
F16K11/0856 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/33] | Title | German: | MEHRWEGE-ARMATUR ZUM UMLENKEN VON STRÖMUNGSRICHTUNGEN VON GASFÖRMIGEN ODER FLÜSSIGEN MEDIEN | [1986/33] | English: | MULTI-WAY VALVE FOR CHANGING THE FLOW DIRECTION OF GASEOUS OR LIQUID MEDIA | [1986/33] | French: | SOUPAPE MULTIVOIE PERMETTANT DE CHANGER LA DIRECTION D'ECOULEMENT DE MILIEUX GAZEUX OU LIQUIDES | [1986/33] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1993 | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.1986 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/13] | 28.08.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1987/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.05.1986 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1986 | 22.05.1986 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1986 | 22.05.1986 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1986 | 22.05.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1986 | 22.05.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1986 | 22.05.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1986 | 22.05.1986 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1986 | 22.05.1986 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1986 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.09.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | CH328844 [ ]; | GB324239 [ ] |