EP0222768 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACCOMPLISHING AN UNDERWATER WELD JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/22] | METHOD, APPARATUS AND ELEMENT FOR ACCOMPLISHING AN UNDERWATER WELD JOINT | ||
[1990/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OY GSS GENERAL SEA SAFETY LTD Merikatu 1 00140 Helsinki / FI | For all designated states NIINIVAARA, Juhani Ensi Kyösti SF-45610 Koria / FI | For all designated states MÄKELÄINEN, Hannu, Kalervo Evakkotie 75 L 6 SF-96100 Rovaniemi / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states OY GSS GENERAL SEA SAFETY LTD Merikatu 1 SF-00140 Helsinki / FI | ||
For all designated states NIINIVAARA, Juhani Ensi Kyösti SF-45610 Koria / FI | |||
For all designated states MÄKELÄINEN, Hannu, Kalervo Evakkotie 75 L 6 SF-96100 Rovaniemi / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIINIVAARA, Juhani SF-45610 Koria / FI | 02 /
MÄKELÄINEN, Hannu Evakkotie 75 L6 SF-96100 Rovaniemi / FI | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/43] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/32] | Rostovanyi, Peter AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [1987/22] | Rostovanyi, Peter AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 85904250.9 | 14.08.1985 | [1987/22] | WO1985FI00068 | Priority number, date | FI19840003199 | 14.08.1984 Original published format: FI 843199 | [1987/22] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601137 | Date: | 27.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0222768 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0222768 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/00 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
B23K9/0061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, IT [1987/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR UNTERWASSERSCHWEISSVERBINDUNG | [1990/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACCOMPLISHING AN UNDERWATER WELD JOINT | [1990/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REALISATION D'UN JOINT DE SOUDAGE SOUS L'EAU | [1990/24] |
Former [1987/22] | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND ELEMENT FÜR UNTERWASSERSCHWEISSVERBINDUNG | ||
Former [1987/22] | METHOD, APPARATUS AND ELEMENT FOR ACCOMPLISHING AN UNDERWATER WELD JOINT | ||
Former [1987/22] | PROCEDE, APPAREIL ET ELEMENT DE REALISATION D'UN JOINT DE SOUDAGE SOUS L'EAU | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.1986 | Translation filed | 12.02.1987 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 12.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/24] | 13.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.06.1990 | FR | 13.06.1990 | IT | 13.06.1990 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 13.06.1990 | |
IT | 13.06.1990 | ||
FR | 02.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/40] | BE | 13.06.1990 | |
FR | 02.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/24] | BE | 13.06.1990 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE414718 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]); | [A]FR2031728 (SOGETRAM TRAVAUX MARITIM); | [A]US3023303 (PETRO SHAJENKO); | [A]US3632950 (BERGHOF ERNEST H); | [A]US4052632 (SAGARA HIDEO, et al); | [A]US4069408 (MASUBUCHI KOICHI, et al); | [A]US4319116 (KAUPPI MARKKU, et al) |