EP0194276 - PRODUCTION OF CHIMERIC ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LIMITED 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LIMITED 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | ||
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LIMITED 216 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4EN / GB | ||
Former [1986/38] | For all designated states CELLTECH LIMITED 244-250 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 4DY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUBERGER, Michael, Samuel 34 Bateman Street Cambridge CB2 1MA / GB | 02 /
RABBITTS, Terence, Howard Woodside, High Street Hildersham Cambridge CB1 6BU / GB | [1986/38] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1986/38] | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85904274.9 | 03.09.1985 | [1986/38] | WO1985GB00392 | Priority number, date | GB19840022238 | 03.09.1984 Original published format: GB 8422238 | [1986/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601533 | Date: | 13.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0194276 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194276 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0194276 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C12N15/62, A61K39/395, C12P21/00, G01N33/563 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
C07K16/44 (EP);
C07K16/462 (EP);
G01N33/531 (EP);
G01N33/563 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1986/38] | C12N15/00, C07K15/00, A61K39/395, C07K3/18, C12N5/00, C12P21/00, G01N33/563 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/38] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON CHIMÄREN ANTIKÖRPERN | [1993/32] | English: | PRODUCTION OF CHIMERIC ANTIBODIES | [1986/38] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ANTICORPS CHIMERIQUES | [1986/38] |
Former [1986/38] | HERSTELLUNG VON SCHIMÄRISCHEN ANTIKÖRPERN | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.1986 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/38] | 20.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 29.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 17.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
26.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Xoma Corp. 2910 Seventh St. Berkeley, California 94710 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | 02
11.05.1994
27.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Gerger, Thomas Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03
11.05.1994
24.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstr. 116 68305 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Schreiner, Siegfried, et al, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (TR-E) Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
26.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Xoma Corp. 2910 Seventh St. Berkeley, California 94710 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
02
11.05.1994
27.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Gerger, Thomas, Dr. Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
03
11.05.1994
24.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstr. 116 68305 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Schreiner, Siegfried, et al, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (TR-E) Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
26.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Xoma Corp. 2910 Seventh St. Berkeley, California 94710 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
02
11.05.1994
27.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Gerger, Thomas, Dr. Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
03
11.05.1994
24.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstr. 116 68305 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Schreiner, Siegfried, et al, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Werk Penzberg, Abt. GE-TB, Postfach 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | |||
Former [2001/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
26.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Xoma Corp. 2910 Seventh St. Berkeley, California 94710 / US Opponent's representative VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
02
11.05.1994
27.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Gerger, Thomas, Dr. Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
03
11.05.1994
24.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstr. 116 68305 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Schreiner, Siegfried, et al, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Werk Penzberg, Abt. GE-TB, Postfach 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | |||
Former [1999/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
26.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Xoma Corp. 2910 Seventh St. Berkeley, California 94710 / US Opponent's representative VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
02
11.05.1994
27.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Gerger, Thomas, Dr. Hoechst Marion Roussel Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
03
11.05.1994
24.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstr. 116 68305 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Schreiner, Siegfried, et al, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Werk Penzberg, Abt. GE-TB, Postfach 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | |||
Former [1999/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
26.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Xoma Corp. 2910 Seventh St. Berkeley, California 94710 / US Opponent's representative VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
02
11.05.1994
27.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Behringwerke Aktiengesellschaft Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich (DE) Behringwerke AG Postfach 11 40 D-35001 Marburg / DE | |||
03
11.05.1994
24.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstr. 116 68305 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Schreiner, Siegfried, et al, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Werk Penzberg, Abt. GE-TB, Postfach 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | |||
Former [1995/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
26.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Xoma Corp. 2910 Seventh St. Berkeley, California 94710 / US Opponent's representative VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
02
11.05.1994
27.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Behringwerke Aktiengesellschaft Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich (DE) Behringwerke AG Postfach 11 40 D-35001 Marburg / DE | |||
03
11.05.1994
24.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH Werk Penzberg Abt. GE-TB, Dr. Schreiner Postfach 1152 82372 Penzberg / DE | |||
Former [1994/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
Xoma Corp. 2910 Seventh St. Berkeley, California 94710 / US Opponent's representative VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
02
11.05.1994
Behringwerke Aktiengesellschaft Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich (DE) Behringwerke AG Postfach 11 40 D-35001 Marburg / DE | |||
03
11.05.1994
Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 D-68298 Mannheim / DE | 24.05.1994 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 26.05.1994 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 26.05.1994 | No. 03: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 01.06.1994 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 08.06.1994 | No. 03: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 08.07.1994 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 01.08.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.04.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.11.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.05.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.09.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.06.1997 | Appeal received No. T0669/97 | 04.09.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.05.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 03.05.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.05.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 28.01.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0068763 [ ] (UNIV TEXAS [US]); | EP0090898 [ ] (GENETIC SYSTEMS CORP [US]); | WO8303971 [ ] (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]); | WO8400382 [ ] (US HEALTH [US]); | EP0105521 [ ] (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | EP0120694 [ ] (CELLTECH LTD [GB]); | EP0150126 [ ] (IMMUNEX CORP [US]); | EP0125023 [ ] | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 95, No. 4, 27 July 1981, Columbus, Ohio (US) V. RASO et al.: "Hybrid Antibodies with Dual Specificity for the Delivery of Ricin to Immunoglobulin-Bearing Target Cells", see page 363, Abstract 30711m, & Cancer Res. 1981, 41(6) 2073-8 (Eng.) | [XP] - Nature, 314, No. 6010, April 1985 London (GB) SHUN-ICHI TAKEDA et al.: "Construction of Chimaeric Processed Immunoglobulin Genes Containing Mouse Variable and Juman Constant Region Sequences", pages 452-454, see the whole article | [XP] - Nature 314, No. 6008, 21st March 1985 London (GB) M. NEUBERGER et al.: "A Hapten-Specific Chimaeric Ig E Antibody with Human Physiological Effector Function", pages 268-270, see the whole article | [XP] - Nature 312, No. 5995, December 1984 London (GB) G. BOULIANNE et al.: "Production of Functional Chimaeric Mouse/Human Antibody", pages 643-646, see the whole article | [XP] - Nature 312, No. 5995, December 1984 London (GB) M. NEUBERGER et al.: "Recombinant Antibodies Possessing Novel Effector Functions", pages 604-608, see the whole article |