EP0227669 - REMOTE SENSOR WITH COMPENSATION FOR LEAD RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEFER, Maurice, E. Rural Route 1 Tremont, IL 61568 / US | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85904338.2 | 19.08.1985 | [1987/28] | WO1985US01573 | Priority number, date | US19850748081 | 24.06.1985 Original published format: US 748081 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700291 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0227669 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01R17/06, G01R17/20 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
G01R17/06 (EP,US);
G01R17/20 (EP,US);
Y10S323/909 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1987/28] | Title | German: | FERNFÜHLER MIT KOMPENSATION DER ZULEITUNGSWIDERSTÄNDE | [1987/28] | English: | REMOTE SENSOR WITH COMPENSATION FOR LEAD RESISTANCE | [1987/28] | French: | CAPTEUR A DISTANCE A COMPENSATION DE LA CHUTE DE TENSION DUE A LA RESISTANCE DU CONDUCTEUR | [1987/28] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.1987 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/15] | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1989 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2648635 [ ] (GRAETZ GMBH & CO OHG); | DE2710581 [ ] (CENTRA BUERKLE GMBH & CO); | FR2426908 [ ] (GALKIN MIKHAIL [SU]); | FR2532759 [ ] (SEDEME [FR]) | [A] - Electronics, Volume 52, No. 15, 19 July 1979, New York, (US) JOHN GOSH: "C-MOS Switches, Bi-FET op Amps helf Shaft-Angle Encoder Cover Full 360}", pages 70-71, see figure on page 70; right-hand columnparagraph 2 |