EP0236304 - AN ARRANGEMENT IN A WHEEL CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1988 [1988/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEKKELUND, Svein Pinaveien 11c N-3200 Sandefjord / NO | [1987/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/38] | Application number, filing date | 85904677.3 | 16.09.1985 | [1987/38] | WO1985NO00054 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701583 | Date: | 26.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0236304 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/10 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
A61G5/1059 (EP);
A61G3/063 (EP);
A61G5/00 (EP);
A61G5/006 (EP);
A61G5/125 (EP);
A61G7/1019 (EP);
A61G7/1032 (EP);
A61G7/1046 (EP);
A61G7/1057 (EP);
A61G7/1059 (EP);
A61G7/1076 (EP);
A61G2200/32 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR ROLLSTUHL | [1987/38] | English: | AN ARRANGEMENT IN A WHEEL CHAIR | [1987/38] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE CHAISE ROULANTE | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 18.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/18] | 10.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.06.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 18.06.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 18.06.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 18.06.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 18.06.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 18.06.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 18.06.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 18.06.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 18.06.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.09.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]SE402862 ; | [Y]SE426357 ; | [Y]US3947902 ; | [Y]US3967328 ; | [Y]US4087873 |