EP0197069 - VESSEL MOORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ITS INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEY OCEAN SERVICES, INC. 732 Pelican Magnolia, TX 77355 / US | [1986/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEY, Joe, W. 732 Pelican Magnolia, TX 77355 / US | 02 /
SCHUMAKER, Fred, E. 2600 S. Gessner Suite 504 Houston, TX 77063 / US | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1987/15] | Gross, Gernot K. Kleiberweg 5 D-65207 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1986/42] | Gross, Gernot K. Kleiberweg 5 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 85904769.8 | 26.09.1985 | [1986/42] | WO1985US01830 | Priority number, date | US19840661690 | 17.10.1984 Original published format: US 661690 | [1986/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602329 | Date: | 24.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0197069 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197069 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/50 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
B63B21/507 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | SCHIFFSANLEGESYSTEM UND METHODE FÜR SEINE INSTALLIERUNG | [1986/42] | English: | VESSEL MOORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ITS INSTALLATION | [1986/42] | French: | SYSTEME D'AMARRAGE D'EMBARCATIONS ET SON PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION | [1990/15] |
Former [1986/42] | SYSTEM D'AMARRAGE D'EMBARCATIONS ET SON PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION. | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1986 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/42] | 24.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.1990 | CH | 11.04.1990 | LI | 11.04.1990 | GB | 26.09.1990 | SE | 27.09.1990 | LU | 30.09.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/52] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
CH | 11.04.1990 | ||
LI | 11.04.1990 | ||
GB | 26.09.1990 | ||
SE | 27.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/24] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
CH | 11.04.1990 | ||
LI | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 27.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
CH | 11.04.1990 | ||
LI | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/46] | CH | 11.04.1990 | |
LI | 11.04.1990 | Cited in | International search | US3191201 [ ] (RICHARDSON GEORGE T, et al); | GB1014879 [ ] (OFFSHORE CO); | GB1189758 [ ] (EXXON PRODUCTION RESEARCH CO [US]); | US4042990 [ ] (DONALDSON JR GLENN B); | US4446807 [ ] (JOHNSON CHARLES A [US], et al) | Examination | US3525312 |