EP0198086 - MOUSE HUMAN HYBRIDOMA PRODUCING ANTIVIRUS HUMAN ANTIBODY, PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION, AND ANTIVIRUS HUMAN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUFO, Yasuhiko 20-2, Tamadaira 5-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Yoh-Ichi 52-14, Higashi-Ikebukuro 5-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170 / JP | 03 /
SUGANO, Toru 2068, Aihara-cho Machida-shi Tokyo 194-02 / JP | 04 /
TOMIBE, Katsuhiko 17-3, Kamiigusa 1-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo 167 / JP | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1986/43] | Application number, filing date | 85904867.0 | 27.09.1985 | [1986/43] | WO1985JP00537 | Priority number, date | JP19840201992 | 28.09.1984 Original published format: JP 20199284 | JP19840209630 | 08.10.1984 Original published format: JP 20963084 | JP19850074520 | 10.04.1985 Original published format: JP 7452085 | [1986/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602092 | Date: | 10.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198086 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198086 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.04.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/28, C12N15/08, C07K15/28, // A61K39/395, C12P21/08 ,(C12N5/08, C12R1:91) | [1991/03] | CPC: |
C07K16/087 (EP,US);
C07K16/088 (EP,US);
C07K16/089 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/43] | C12N5/00, C12N15/00, C07K15/06, // A61K39/395, C12P21/00 ,(C12N5/00, C12R1:91) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | MAUS/MENSCH-HYBRIDOMA MIT ERZEUGUNG VON ANTIVIRALEN MENSCHLICHEN ANTIKÖRPERN, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND ANTIVIRALE MENSCHLICHE MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER | [1986/43] | English: | MOUSE HUMAN HYBRIDOMA PRODUCING ANTIVIRUS HUMAN ANTIBODY, PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION, AND ANTIVIRUS HUMAN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY | [1986/43] | French: | HYBRIDOME HOMME-SOURIS PRODUISANT UN ANTICORPS HUMAIN ANTIVIRAL, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL HUMAIN ANTIVIRAL | [1986/43] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1986 | Translation filed | 03.06.1986 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1986 | Search fee paid | 03.06.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 09.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0148644 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) | International search | [A]JPS5417185 (WISTAR INST); | [X]JPS58128323 (SANDOZ AG) | by applicant | JPS58175489 | JPS592276 |