EP0195071 - MICROBIOLOGICAL METHOD FOR THE REMOVAL OF CONTAMINANTS FROM COAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAMBDA GROUP, INC. 1445 Summit Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [1986/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVISON, Mary, Jo 2874 Mount Holyoke Road Columbus, OH 43221 / US | [1986/39] | Application number, filing date | 85904915.7 | 17.09.1985 | [1986/39] | WO1985US01794 | Priority number, date | US19840651837 | 18.09.1984 Original published format: US 651837 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601820 | Date: | 27.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195071 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C10G32/00, C12N1/02, C12N1/20, C12N13/00, C22B1/11, C12N1/12 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
C10G1/00 (EP);
C10L9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | MIKROBIOLOGISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON SCHADSTOFFEN AUS KOHLEN | [1986/39] | English: | MICROBIOLOGICAL METHOD FOR THE REMOVAL OF CONTAMINANTS FROM COAL | [1986/39] | French: | PROCEDE MICROBIOLOGIQUE D'ELIMINATION DES SUBSTANCES CONTAMINANTES DU CHARBON | [1986/39] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/12] | 01.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1987/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.06.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.09.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4206288 ; | [Y]US2975103 ; | [Y]US4260394 ; | [Y]US4081251 ; | [Y]US2641564 ; | [Y]US2574070 ; | [A]US3679397 ; | [A]US3970518 ; | [A]US4269699 | [Y] - Mining Congress Journal, Volume 65, issued July 1979, DETZ et al, Microbial Desulfurization of Coal, pages 75-86see page 78. | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 91, issued 1979, GRUDEV et alAbstract Number 207049x. | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 94, issued 1981, VOLSICKY et alAbstract Number 71160d. | [A] - Applied and Environmental Microbiology, Volume 42, Number 2, issued August 1981, HOFFMAN et al, Kinetics of the Removal of Iron Pyrite from Coal by Microbial Catalysispages 259-271. | [A] - Fuel, Volume 59, issued April 1980, CHANDRA et al, Removal of Sulfur from Coal by Thiobacillas Ferrooxidans and by Mixed Acidophilic Bacteria Present in Coalpages 249-252. |