EP0197991 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS BASED ON THIN LAYERS TRANSISTORS AND CAPACITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1989 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS représenté par le Ministre des PTT (Centre National d'Etudes des Télécommunications) 38-40 rue du Général Leclerc 92131 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS représenté par le Ministre des PTT (Centre National d'Etudes des Télécommunications) 38-40 rue du Général Leclerc F-92131 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states L'Etat Français, représenté par le Ministre des P.T.T. (Centre National d'Etudes des Télécommunications) 38-40 rue du Général Leclerc F-92131 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COISSARD, Pierre 6, Résidence Argensol F-84100 Orange / FR | 02 /
RICHARD, Joseph 33, Lotissement Keranroux-Ploubezre F-22300 Lannion / FR | 03 /
MORIN, François Le Carpont Laumerin F-22300 Lannion / FR | [1989/03] |
Former [1986/43] | 01 /
COISSARD, Pierre 31, Résidence Corlay F-22300 Lannion / FR | ||
02 /
RICHARD, Joseph 33, Lotissement Keranroux-Ploubezre F-22300 Lannion / FR | |||
03 /
MORIN, François Le Carpont Laumerin F-22300 Lannion / FR | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1986/43] | Application number, filing date | 85904985.0 | 11.10.1985 | [1986/43] | WO1985FR00288 | Priority number, date | FR19840015898 | 17.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8415898 | [1986/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602489 | Date: | 24.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0197991 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197991 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/84, H01L27/13 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
H01L27/1255 (EP,US);
G02F1/1368 (EP,US);
H01L27/1214 (EP,US);
H01L27/13 (EP,US);
H01L29/78666 (EP,US);
G02F2202/103 (EP,US);
Y10S438/967 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON ELEKTRISCHEN SCHALTKREISEN MIT DÜNNSCHICHTIGEN TRANSISTOREN UND KONDENSATOREN | [1986/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS BASED ON THIN LAYERS TRANSISTORS AND CAPACITORS | [1986/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CIRCUITS ELECTRONIQUES A BASE DE TRANSISTORS EN COUCHES MINCES ET DE CONDENSATEURS | [1986/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.1986 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 16.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0082783 [ ] (MORIN FRANCOIS [FR], et al); | US4332075 [ ] (OTA ISAO, et al) | [A] - Electronics International, Vol. 55, No. 10, 19 May 1982, New York, (US) R.T. GALLAGHER: "Amorphous Silicon Enlarges LCD's, pages 94-96 | Examination | GB2115199 | EP0031143 | EP0086349 |