EP0197100 - APPARATUS FOR MAGNETIC POSITION DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1987 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.L. TIEDEMANNS TOBAKSFABRIK JOH H ANDRESEN Johan H. Andresens vei 5 0655 Oslo 6 / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states J.L. TIEDEMANNS TOBAKSFABRIK JOH H ANDRESEN Johan H. Andresens vei 5 N-0655 Oslo 6 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMEN, Hans, Kristian Vestbrenne 26 N-1300 Sandvika / NO | [1986/42] | Application number, filing date | 85904994.2 | 07.10.1985 | [1986/42] | WO1985NO00064 | Priority number, date | NO19840004058 | 10.10.1984 Original published format: NO 844058 | [1986/42] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602444 | Date: | 24.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0197100 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/72, // G01B7/02 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
G01F23/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MAGNETISCHEN BESTIMMUNG EINER STELLE | [1986/42] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MAGNETIC POSITION DETERMINATION | [1986/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE DETERMINATION MAGNETIQUE DE POSITION | [1986/42] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1993 | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1986 | Translation filed | Examination procedure | 11.09.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/17] | 30.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1987/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 10.07.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 10.07.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 10.07.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 10.07.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 10.07.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 10.07.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 10.07.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 10.07.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 10.07.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.10.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]NO113393C ; | [Y]DE1018540 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]US3437771 (NUSBAUM HENRY); | [A]DE2421552 (LINDE AG); | [Y]NO134572B (NORAPP AS [NO]); | [Y]US3982087 (BACHMAN ALBERT J); | [Y]US4056979 (BONGORT EDGAR A, et al); | [Y]US4064755 (BONGORT EDGAR A, et al); | [Y]DE2806773 (KERN & GROSSKINSKY); | [Y]US4204158 (RICOUARD JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al); | [Y]US4361835 (NAGY BELA G); | [Y]US4466284 (DUMERY STEFAAN D [US]) | [Y] - Derwent's abstract nr K 1806 B/43SU 645 016 (PENZA POLY) 30 January 1979 |