EP0197104 - EXTRUSION PROCESS FOR PREPARING IMPROVED BROMINATED BUTYL RUBBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O. Box 503 Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [1989/51] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O. Box 503 Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOWALSKI, Ronald, Charles 108 Union Avenue New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, William, Myers 715 Saint Marks Avenue Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 03 /
NEWMAN, Neil, Frederick 21 Eagle Road Edison, NJ 08820 / US | 04 /
FOROULIS, Zisis, Andrew 33 Franklin Road Mendham, NJ 07945 / US | 05 /
BALDWIN, Francis, Paul 2094W-320 North Coupeville, WA 98239 / US | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.Po. Box 1 Abingdon, Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.Po. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 85905024.7 | 26.09.1985 | [1986/42] | WO1985US01856 | Priority number, date | US19840656664 | 01.10.1984 Original published format: US 656664 | [1986/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602082 | Date: | 10.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0197104 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197104 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/20, C08F8/22 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
C08F8/20 (EP,US);
C08C19/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/20, C08F210/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | EXTRUSIONSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VERBESSERTER BROMIERTER BUTYLKAUTSCHUKE | [1986/42] | English: | EXTRUSION PROCESS FOR PREPARING IMPROVED BROMINATED BUTYL RUBBER | [1986/42] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXTRUSION POUR PREPARER DU BUTYLCAOUTCHOUC BROME | [1986/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.1986 | Search fee paid | 01.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/42] | 10.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.07.1986 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   01.08.1986 | 02.07.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   01.08.1986 | 02.07.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   01.08.1986 | 02.07.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   01.08.1986 | 02.07.1986 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   01.08.1986 | 02.07.1986 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   01.08.1986 | 02.07.1986 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   01.08.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.12.1991 | [1993/14] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3023191 (TEGGE BRUCE R, et al); | [A]US3242148 (KINCHEN J D, et al); | [A]US3510416 (VACCARI PIETRO, et al); | [A]US3936430 (SCHOEN LOWHARDT A A, et al); | [A]GB1483063 (DOVER CHEM CORP); | [A]GB1483064 (DOVER CHEM CORP); | [A]US4185057 (LOETTERLE MARVIN F [US], et al); | [A]US4288575 (GARDNER IRWIN J) |