EP0203094 - Balloon catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/49] | METHOD FOR PARTING RUBBER AND PRODUCTS FORMED THEREBY, AND A METHOD OF MAKING A BLOOD VESSEL | ||
[1993/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.1994 [1994/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYMED LABORATORIES 2681-A Dow Avenue Tustin, CA 92680 / US | [1986/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUDAGAR, Abdul, Sattar 12 Eastshore Irvine, CA 92714 / US | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Massey, Alexander, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [1987/10] |
Former [1986/49] | Massey, Alexander MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 85905304.3 | 22.10.1985 | [1986/49] | WO1985US02066 | Priority number, date | US19840665295 | 26.10.1984 Original published format: US 665295 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602580 | Date: | 09.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203094 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203094 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.05.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00, A61L29/00, B29C33/62, B29C37/00 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
B29C37/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2/06 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L29/06 (EP,US);
B29C33/62 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1386 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, A61F2/06, A61F2/04, C08L83/04, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
A61L27/18, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
A61L27/18, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
A61L29/06, C08L83/04 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1986/49] | B05D3/02 | Designated contracting states | FR, IT [1986/49] | Title | German: | Ballonkatheter | [1993/30] | English: | Balloon catheter | [1993/30] | French: | Cathéter à ballon | [1993/30] |
Former [1986/49] | METHODE ZUR TRENNUNG VON KAUTSCHUK UND DIE SO GEFORMTEN PRODUKTE UND EINE METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BLUTGEFÄSSES | ||
Former [1986/49] | METHOD FOR PARTING RUBBER AND PRODUCTS FORMED THEREBY, AND A METHOD OF MAKING A BLOOD VESSEL | ||
Former [1986/49] | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DE CAOUTCHOUC ET PRODUITS AINSI FORMES, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN VAISSEAU SANGUIN | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1986 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1986 | Search fee paid | 22.07.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 07.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3292627 (ANDREW HARAUTUNEIAN); | [Y]US4055682 (MERRILL EDWARD WILSON); | [A]US4059708 (HEISS JR JOHN HERBERT, et al); | [XD]US3452756 (HARAUTUNEIAN ANDREW); | [X]US3544668 (DERENIUK PAUL); | [AD]US3983879 (TODD DONALD A); | [X]DE2951566 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) | International search | [Y]US3077647 (KUGLER ALFRED E); | [X]US3304353 (ANDREW HARAUTUNEIAN); | [Y]US3406236 (WILFRIED KNIEGE); | [Y]US3474166 (BABCOCK EDWARD V); | [Y]US3539674 (DERENIUK PAUL, et al); | [A]US3585647 (GAJEWSKI HENRY M, et al); | [A]US3823023 (DUGGINS R, et al); | [A]US3941907 (KLEMENT GUNTER, et al); | [A]US3953559 (WEBER KARL-ARNOLD, et al); | [Y]US3990990 (KOJIMA TATSUO, et al); | [Y]US3993494 (NYMAN TAGE); | [Y]US4055682 (MERRILL EDWARD WILSON); | [Y]US4110119 (BOEHMKE GUNTHER, et al); | [A]US4118235 (HORIUCHI NORIO, et al); | [A]US4263250 (SCHMIDT GUENTER, et al); | [Y]US4265848 (RUESCH HEINZ); | [Y]US4266999 (BAIER ROBERT E) |