EP0198094 - TOOTH PASTE BINDER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1 Teppo-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590 / JP | ||
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 1-banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590 / JP | ||
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUI, Yoshitaka 500, Kamiyobe Yobeku, Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-12 / JP | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85905422.3 | 24.10.1985 | [1986/43] | WO1985JP00593 | Priority number, date | JP19840223380 | 24.10.1984 Original published format: JP 22338084 | [1986/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602547 | Date: | 09.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198094 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198094 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.05.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP);
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61K2800/5422 (EP);
A61K2800/5424 (EP);
A61K2800/594 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/43] | Title | German: | BINDEMITTEL FÜR ZAHNPASTE | [1986/43] | English: | TOOTH PASTE BINDER COMPOSITION | [1986/43] | French: | COMPOSITION LIANTE POUR PATE DENTIFRICE | [1986/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1986 | Translation filed | 24.06.1986 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1986 | Search fee paid | 24.06.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05933210 | Examination | - Hawleys Condensed Chemical Dictionary, 11th, ed., van Nostrand and Reinhold Co., New York, USA |