EP0202284 - DEVICE FOR CLEANING TAPE CONTACTING MEMBERS IN VIDEO TAPE RECORDERS AND THE LIKE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zago, Giovanni Via N. Aprilis 41 I-33080 San Quirino (Province of Pordenone) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | For all designated states Zago, Giovanni Via N. Aprilis 41 I-33080 San Quirino (Province of Pordenone) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/48] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. Zini, Maranesi & C. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85905816.6 | 19.11.1985 | [1986/48] | WO1985EP00630 | Priority number, date | IT19840083439 | 22.11.1984 Original published format: IT 8343984 | [1986/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603326 | Date: | 05.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0202284 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/04, G11B5/41 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
G11B5/41 (EP,US);
G11B23/049 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/52] |
Former [1986/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BANDKONTAKTELEMENTE IN VIDEOBANDAUFNAHMEGERÄTEN UND ÄHNLICHEN GERÄTEN | [1986/48] | English: | DEVICE FOR CLEANING TAPE CONTACTING MEMBERS IN VIDEO TAPE RECORDERS AND THE LIKE APPARATUS | [1986/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE DES ORGANES EN CONTACT AVEC LA BANDE DANS DES MAGNETOSCOPES ET APPAREILS ANALOGUES | [1986/48] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/03] | 21.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   16.10.1986 | 22.08.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   16.10.1986 | 22.08.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   16.10.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS58114324 ; | DE2158994 [ ] (METROSOUND MFG CO LTD); | EP0028708 [ ] (KOENIG F W ELECTRONIC [DE]); | BE894385 [ ] (STAAR SA); | DE3212730 [ ] (BUSCHER ALFRED); | WO8402418 [ ] (BLANK THOMAS H [DE], et al); | EP0123124 [ ] (ZAGO GIOVANNI [IT], et al) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 7, No. 224 (P-227) (1369), 5 October 1983, & JP, A, 58114324 (Akai Denki) 7 July 1983see Abstract; figures |