EP0204759 - PLEASURE BOAT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAT, Frédéric Jean Jérome 4, allée d'Aquitaine F-77176 Savigny-Le-Temple / FR | [1986/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou Société Civile 4-5, boulevard de la Mediterranée F-31400 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 85906078.2 | 09.12.1985 | [1986/51] | WO1985FR00354 | Priority number, date | FR19840019939 | 14.12.1984 Original published format: FR 8419939 | FR19850011651 | 24.07.1985 Original published format: FR 8511651 | [1986/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603722 | Date: | 03.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0204759 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204759 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/12 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
B63B1/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/51] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR FÜR FREIZEITSCHIFF | [1986/51] | English: | PLEASURE BOAT STRUCTURE | [1986/51] | French: | STRUCTURE DE BATEAU DE TYPE PLAISANCE | [1986/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1986 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 29.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.02.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.1989 | GB | 15.03.1989 | [2000/03] |
Former [1990/09] | AT | 15.03.1989 | Cited in | International search | US3077850 [ ] (BEUBY WILLIAM C); | GB922065 [ ] (DOUGLAS POLE WELMAN); | FR2464878 [ ] (WAQUET BERNARD [FR]); | EP0004796 [ ] (HEINRICH BERND) |