EP0187648 - Method for the production of chromium phosphate coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION (a Delaware corp.) 300 Brookside Avenue Ambler, PA 19002 / US | [1989/51] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 300 Brookside Avenue Ambler Pennsylvania 19002 / US | ||
Former [1986/29] | For all designated states AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC. 300 Brookside Avenue Ambler Pennsylvania 19002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dollman, David Y. 3 Belmont Square Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | 02 /
McMillen, Mark W. Box 167 RR 1 Perkasie, PA 18944 / US | [1986/29] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1989/50] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1989/35] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1986/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100076.8 | 04.01.1986 | [1986/29] | Priority number, date | US19850689197 | 07.01.1985 Original published format: US 689197 | [1986/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0187648 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0187648 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/33, C23C22/38 | [1986/29] | CPC: |
C23C22/33 (EP,US);
C23C22/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1986/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Chromphosphatüberzügen | [1986/29] | English: | Method for the production of chromium phosphate coatings | [1986/29] | French: | Procédé pour former des revêtements de phosphate de chrome | [1986/29] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 25.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2438877 (SPRUANCE JR FRANK PALIN); | [X]FR1215762 (PARKER STE CONTINENTALE); | [X]DE1234481 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [A]US3481797 (LELAND JAMES F, et al) |