EP0188271 - Error correction encoding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.1993 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukasawa, Atsushi Oki Electric Ind. Co. Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sato, Takuro Oki Electric Ind. Co. Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Akiyama, Haruhiko Oki Electric Ind. Co. Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kawabe, Manabu Oki Electric Ind. Co. Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Betten, Jürgen, et al Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | Betten, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/48] | Betten, Jürgen Dipl.-Ing. Betten & Gleiss Patentanwälte Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-8000 München 5 / DE | ||
Former [1986/30] | Betten, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Lieck & Betten Maximiliansplatz 10 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100413.3 | 14.01.1986 | [1986/30] | Priority number, date | JP19850003381 | 14.01.1985 Original published format: JP 338185 | JP19850005009 | 17.01.1985 Original published format: JP 500985 | [1986/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0188271 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0188271 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0188271 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00, H04L1/12 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
H03M13/03 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0015 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/0073 (EP,US);
H04L1/1819 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/30] | H03M13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/30] | Title | German: | Fehlerkorrekturkodierungssystem | [1986/30] | English: | Error correction encoding system | [1986/30] | French: | Système de codage de correction d'erreurs | [1986/30] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 23.10.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 14.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]GB2160392 (RACAL RES LTD); | [A]US3496549 (TONG SHIH Y); | [A]US3078443 (ROSE ALAN C); | [A]US3646518 (WEINSTEIN STEPHEN BRANT) | Examination | JPS52147905 | JPS5921149 | - IEEE Transactions on communications, vol. com-28, No.2, Feb 1980, pages 187-195. | - G.C. Clark, Jr. & J.B.Cain: " Error correction coding for digital communications ", Plenum Press, New York and London 1981, page 11, 352-354 | - Electronics, 27 Dec. 1965, pages 70-79. |