EP0189780 - Shock wave discharge tube with a prolonged working life [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.1989 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1989 [1989/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naser, Georg Karlstrasse 10 D-8502 Zirndorf / DE | 02 /
Reichenberger, Helmut, Dr. Begonienstrasse 28 D-8501 Zirndorf / DE | 03 /
Schlee, Karl-Heinz Nürnberger Strasse 18 D-8524 Neunkirchen / DE | [1986/32] | Application number, filing date | 86100418.2 | 14.01.1986 | [1986/32] | Priority number, date | DE19853502751 | 28.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3502751 | [1986/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0189780 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189780 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, G10K15/04 | [1986/32] | CPC: |
G10K9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/32] | Title | German: | Stosswellenrohr mit einer langen Lebensdauer | [1986/32] | English: | Shock wave discharge tube with a prolonged working life | [1986/32] | French: | Tube éclateur à ondes de chocs à longue durée de vie | [1986/32] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 26.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1191720 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]US3189767 (GOLDMAN RICHARD G, et al); | [Y]US4135601 (TSUKAGOSHI TSUNEHIRO, et al); | [A]EP0045412 (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2411865 (BOSTWICK LEE G, et al); | [AP]DE8521196U | by applicant | DE3312014 |