EP0189126 - Container dwelling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.1990 [1990/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rud. Otto Meyer Am Stadtrand 61/Tilsiter Str. 162 D-2000 Hamburg 60 / DE | [1989/52] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states Wenk, Hans-Joachim Düstelstücken 3 D-2359 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | ||
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states Carl Tiedemann KG Rödingsmarkt 20/26 D-2000 Hamburg 11 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenk, Hans-Joachim Düstelstücken 3 D-2359 Henstedt-Ulzburg 2 / DE | [1990/01] |
Former [1989/52] | 01 /
* * * | ||
Former [1988/39] | 01 /
* * * | ||
Former [1986/31] | 01 /
Wenk, Hans-Joachim Düstelstücken 3 D-2359 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1990/15] |
Former [1989/52] | Heldt, Gert, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Neuer Wall 59 III D-20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1988/48] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1986/31] | Heldt, Gert, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Neuer Wall 59 III D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100529.6 | 17.01.1986 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | DE19853501630 | 19.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3501630 | [1986/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189126 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189126 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/348, E04B1/343 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
E04B1/343 (EP);
E04B1/348 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | Containerwohnsystem | [1986/31] | English: | Container dwelling system | [1986/31] | French: | Système d'habitation en conteneur | [1986/31] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/24] | 12.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 26.02.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.1988 | 01.02.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.1989 | 31.01.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3793796 (HUGHES R); | [A]FR2273924 (AMP INC [FR]); | [Y]AT342830B (GFOLLNER LEOPOLD JUN [AT]); | [A]GB2084213 (PORTAKABIN LTD); | [A]DE3208302 (HAEFELFINGER ROBERT) |