EP0189152 - A device for the separation of the lighter fraction from the heavier fraction of a liquid sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company Mack Centre Drive P.O. Box 2224 Paramus New Jersey 07652-1149 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company Mack Centre Drive P.O. Box 2224 Paramus New Jersey 07652-1149 / US | ||
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company Mack Centre Drive P.O. Box 2224 Paramus New Jersey 07652-1149 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oberhardt, Bruce J. Ten Thousand Grafton Road Raleigh, NC / US | 02 /
Palmer, Phyllis J. 2202 Rada Drive Durham, NC / US | [1991/42] |
Former [1986/31] | 01 /
Oberhardt, Bruce J. Ten Thousand Grafton Road Raleigh North Carolina / US | ||
02 /
Palmer, Phyllis J. 2202 Rada Drive Durham North Carolina / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1986/31] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100618.7 | 18.01.1986 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | US19850694717 | 25.01.1985 Original published format: US 694717 | [1986/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189152 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189152 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189152 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/28, G01N33/48 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
B01D61/18 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25375 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/31] | B01D13/00, G01N33/48 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Trennen einer leichteren Phase von einer schwereren Phase einer flüssigen Probe | [1986/31] | English: | A device for the separation of the lighter fraction from the heavier fraction of a liquid sample | [1986/31] | French: | Appareil pour la séparation d'un échantillon liquide en une phase légère et une phase lourde | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 14.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0184852 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [Y]US3705100 (BLATT WILLIAM F, et al); | [YD]US4343705 (LEGG KENNETH D); | [A]FR2536671 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2511872 (MESSIER DENIS [CA]); | [A]US3687296 (SPINOSA DOM, et al) |