EP0192958 - Display control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kretzschmar, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Im Kirchspitzen 19 D-7552 Durmersheim / DE | 02 /
Kern, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Spöcker Strasse 2 D-7500 Karlsruhe 31 / DE | [1986/36] | Application number, filing date | 86100786.2 | 22.01.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | DE19853503277 | 31.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3503277 | [1986/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0192958 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0192958 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/16 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
G09G5/222 (EP);
G09G5/393 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/36] | Title | German: | Sichtgerätesteuerung | [1986/36] | English: | Display control device | [1986/36] | French: | Système de commande d'un dispositif d'affichage | [1986/36] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/31] | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.01.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4070662 ; | [Y]US4317114 ; | [A]EP0008324 ; | [A]WO8001422 ; | [A]EP0106601 |