EP0189860 - Method for correcting picture errors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.01.1992 [1992/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strehl, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Drozzaweg 1 D-8000 München 70 / DE | [1986/32] | Application number, filing date | 86100924.9 | 23.01.1986 | [1986/32] | Priority number, date | DE19853502317 | 24.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3502317 | [1986/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0189860 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189860 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/137 | [1986/32] | CPC: |
H04N19/895 (EP,US);
H04N19/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bildfehlerkorrektur | [1986/32] | English: | Method for correcting picture errors | [1986/32] | French: | Méthode de correction d'erreurs d'image | [1986/32] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 17.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.07.1989 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.01.1991 | LI | 31.01.1991 | [1992/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - 10. JAHRESTAGUNG DER FKTG, München, 13. - 17. September 1982, Seiten 526-548, FKTG, Mainz, DE; D. WESTERKAMP et al.: "Digitale Magnetbandaufzeichnung von Video- und Audiosignalen auf einem Videocassettenrecorder" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, Band COM-21, Nr. 6, Juni 1973, Seiten 695-706, IEEE, New York, US; D.J. CONNOR: "Techniques for reducing the visibility of transmission errors in digitally encoded video signals" | [ ] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, Band COM-21, Nr. 6, Juni 1973, Seiten 695-706, IEEE, New York, US; D.J. CONNOR: "Techniques for reducing the visibility of transmission errors in digitally encoded video signals" |