EP0197252 - Device for generating lift-well information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Kenneth, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Charles Cavin Clos du Brit CH-1083 Mézières / CH | 02 /
Ferrario, Renato Gotthardstrasse CH-6484 Wassen / CH | 03 /
Hochstrasser, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. ETH Fluhmattstrasse 55 CH-6004 Luzern / CH | [1986/42] | Application number, filing date | 86101380.3 | 03.02.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | CH19850001436 | 03.04.1985 Original published format: CH 143685 | [1986/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0197252 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197252 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/34 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
B66B1/3492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/42] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Erzeugung von Schachtinformationen bei einem Aufzug | [1986/42] | English: | Device for generating lift-well information | [1986/42] | French: | Dispositif générant des informations concernant le puits d'un ascenseur | [1986/42] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 22.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1584118 ; | [X]FR2261966 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2349168 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]); | [X]US4134476 (ZOLNEROVICH JR WALTER, et al); | [A]GB2063521 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]US4494628 (UHEREK VLADIMIR [US], et al) |