EP0191409 - Slip casting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/34] | Slip casting method and casting mold | ||
[1989/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1990 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Natori, Tetsuo 120-33 Ooaota Kashiwa-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Shimaguchi, Takashi 213-106 Hakari, Minori-machi Higashiibaraki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Akihide 169-15, Shouei, Sakura-mura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Toshihiro 1569-48, Nakayama, Sumiyoshi, Tomobe-machi Nishiibaraki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1989/51] |
Former [1986/34] | 01 /
Natori, Tetsuo 120-33 Ooaota Kashiwa-shi Chiba-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Shimaguchi, Takashi 213-106 Hakari Minori-machi Higashiibaraki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Watanabe, Akihide 169-15, Shouei Sakura-mura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Yamada, Toshihiro 1569-48, Nakayama Sumiyoshi Tomobe-machi Nishiibaraki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Postfach 95 01 60 D-81517 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Postfach 95 01 60 D-81517 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101459.5 | 05.02.1986 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | JP19850021696 | 08.02.1985 Original published format: JP 2169685 | JP19850024323 | 13.02.1985 Original published format: JP 2432385 | [1986/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0191409 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191409 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/26, C08J9/26 | [1986/34] | CPC: |
C04B35/634 (EP,US);
B28B1/26 (KR);
B22F3/22 (EP,US);
B28B1/263 (EP,US);
C08J7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1986/34] | Title | German: | Schlickergiessverfahren | [1989/51] | English: | Slip casting method | [1989/51] | French: | Procédé par coulage en barbotine | [1989/51] |
Former [1986/34] | Schlickergiessverfahren und Giessform | ||
Former [1986/34] | Slip casting method and casting mold | ||
Former [1986/34] | Procédé par coulage en barbotine et moule | Examination procedure | 05.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 22.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3511694 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | GB1390033 [ ] (SCHWARZHEIDE SYNTHESEWERK VEB); | GB1594033 [ ] (FORD MOTOR CO); | DE415091 [ ] (TON & STEINZEUGWERKE AKT GES F); | US1846279 [ ] (WILLIAM SPEIRS CHARLES); | EP0135292 [ ] (DUOLITE INT SA [FR]); | WO8502578 [ ] (WILL GUENTHER); | GB1205952 [ ] (BRITISH CERAMIC RES ASS); | FR1597279 [ ] | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, section C, Vol. 6, no. 131, July 17, 1982 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT |