EP0190749 - Service apparatus for machines using continuous strips of paper forms or sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meschi, Luciano Corso Amedeo 73 I-57100 Livorno / IT | [1986/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/33] | Representative(s) | Eitle, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/33] | Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101514.7 | 06.02.1986 | [1986/33] | Priority number, date | IT19850019401 | 06.02.1985 Original published format: IT 1940185 | [1986/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0190749 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0190749 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0190749 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/101 | [1986/33] | CPC: |
B65H21/00 (EP);
B65H45/1015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Handhaben von Endlosformularen oder Bogen in Maschinen | [1986/33] | English: | Service apparatus for machines using continuous strips of paper forms or sheets | [1986/33] | French: | Dispositif de service pour machines utilisant des formulaires sans fin ou des feuilles | [1986/33] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 16.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 31.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.05.1990 | BE | 09.05.1990 | CH | 09.05.1990 | LI | 09.05.1990 | NL | 09.05.1990 | SE | 09.05.1990 | GB | 06.02.1991 | [1992/06] |
Former [1991/24] | AT | 09.05.1990 | |
BE | 09.05.1990 | ||
CH | 09.05.1990 | ||
LI | 09.05.1990 | ||
NL | 09.05.1990 | ||
SE | 09.05.1990 | ||
Former [1991/18] | AT | 09.05.1990 | |
CH | 09.05.1990 | ||
LI | 09.05.1990 | ||
NL | 09.05.1990 | ||
SE | 09.05.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | AT | 09.05.1990 | |
CH | 09.05.1990 | ||
LI | 09.05.1990 | ||
SE | 09.05.1990 | ||
Former [1991/08] | CH | 09.05.1990 | |
LI | 09.05.1990 | ||
SE | 09.05.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | SE | 09.05.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE503811 ; | [A]DE1158354 (HINNIGER AUTOMATIC DRUCKMASCH); | [A]US3198518 (CARLSON SR JOHN I, et al); | [A]US3640521 (HUTLEY RONALD W F); | [A]JPS5953200 (UNO TADAO) |