EP0194445 - Auto tracking apparatus for video tape recorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwasaki, Yasuo Shoei-ryo 30-23, Miyuki Higashi-machi Neyagawa-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Nishino, Takafumi 11-26, Oote-cho Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Masaaki 1-224, Nishitada Higashi-touge Kawanishi-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1986/38] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/38] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101541.0 | 06.02.1986 | [1986/38] | Priority number, date | JP19850023885 | 08.02.1985 Original published format: JP 2388585 | [1986/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0194445 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0194445 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194445 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/592 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
G11B5/592 (EP,US);
G11B5/588 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/38] | Title | German: | Einrichtung für die Spurnachführung für einen Videobandrecorder | [1986/38] | English: | Auto tracking apparatus for video tape recorder | [1986/38] | French: | Arrangement pour le suivi de piste pour un magnétoscope | [1986/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 23.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5764325 ; | [XP]JP60131678 ; | [A]GB2097968 (SONY CORP) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 145 (P-132)[1023], 4th August 1982; & JP - A - 57 64325 (SONY K.K.) 19-04-1982, & JP5764325 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 296 (P-407)[2019], 22nd November 1985; & JP - A - 60 131 678 (CANON K.K.) 13-07-1985, & JP60131678 A 00000000 |