EP0191442 - Epoxy resin adhesive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken 755-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | For all designated states UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inaike, Tosihiro c/o Ube Industries Ltd. Hirakata Kenkyusho 3-10 Nakamiyakitamachi Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kido, Kunio c/o Ube Industries Ltd. Hirakata Kenkyusho 3-10 Nakamiyakitamachi Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Matumoto, Takao c/o Ube Industries Ltd. Hirakata Kenkyusho 3-10 Nakamiyakitamachi Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Sroka, Peter-Christian, et al Bauer Wagner Pellengahr Sroka Patent- & Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | Sroka, Peter-Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 11 10 38 D-40510 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101639.2 | 08.02.1986 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | JP19850023599 | 12.02.1985 Original published format: JP 2359985 | [1986/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191442 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191442 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191442 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/54, C09J163/00, // (C08L63/00, 77:06) | [1991/25] | CPC: |
C08G59/54 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C09J163/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J163/00, C08L77/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/34] | C08G59/54, C09J3/16, // (C08L63/00, 77:06) | Designated contracting states | DE [1986/34] | Title | German: | Epoxydharz-Klebstoffzusammensetzung | [1986/34] | English: | Epoxy resin adhesive composition | [1986/34] | French: | Composition adhésive à base de résine époxyde | [1986/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 24.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CS165483 ; | [X]EP0030668 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]); | [YD]US4447579 (TAKAGI YASUO [JP], et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, 1977, page 36, abstract no. 40320g, Columbus, Ohio, US; & CS-A-165 483 (B. SVOBODA et al.) 15-10-1976, & CS165483 A 00000000 |