EP0193061 - Viability test device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states MILES INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | ||
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hemmes, Paul 1825 Brookwood/Drive Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | 02 /
Ismail, Ibrahim A. 51701 Northfield/Drive Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | 03 /
Skarstedt, Mark T. 53823 County Rd. 5, North Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | 04 /
Zipp, Adam 21144 County Rd. 126 Goshen IN / US | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Dänner, Klaus, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Rechtspolitik Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | Dänner, Klaus, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101968.5 | 17.02.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | US19850705711 | 26.02.1985 Original published format: US 705711 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193061 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193061 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193061 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/96, G01N33/52, C12Q1/54, C12Q1/00 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
G01N33/521 (EP,US);
C12Q1/54 (EP,US);
Y10T436/104998 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/30] | G01N33/96, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/54, C12Q1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1986/36] | G01N33/52, C12Q1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/36] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Nachweis der Verwendbarkeit | [1986/36] | English: | Viability test device | [1986/36] | French: | Dispositif pour l'essai de l'application | [1986/36] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 05.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3920580 [ ] (MAST RAYMOND L); | US4298498 [ ] (REHNER HELMUT, et al) |