EP0196438 - Valve control for a reciprocating internal-combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rembold, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Öhringerstrasse 27 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | 02 /
Ruoff, Manfred Hohenstaufenstrasse 19 D-7141 Möglingen / DE | 03 /
Walter, Teegen Im Raisger 4 D-7050 Waiblingen 7 / DE | [1986/41] | Application number, filing date | 86102123.6 | 19.02.1986 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | DE19853511820 | 30.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3511820 | [1986/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0196438 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0196438 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196438 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/02, F01L13/00, F01L1/24, F16K11/07 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
F01L13/0005 (EP,US);
F01L9/14 (EP,US);
F02D13/06 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34446 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/41] | Title | German: | Ventilsteuervorrichtung für eine Hubkolben-Brennkraftmaschine | [1986/41] | English: | Valve control for a reciprocating internal-combustion engine | [1986/41] | French: | Commande de soupape pour un moteur à combustion interne alternatif | [1986/41] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 03.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4111165 (AOYAMA SYUNITI, et al); | [A]DE2907033 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]DE2926327 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | [AD]DE3135650 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |