EP0193154 - Potential-causing element for immunosensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JURIDICAL FOUNDATION THE CHEMO-SERO-THERAPEUTIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE 668, Okubo Shimizu-machi Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states Juridical Foundation The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute 668, Okubo Shimizu-machi Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Isao 14-31, Kita-jutaku Higashi-machi Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | 02 /
Yasukouchi, Kazuo 1-6-54, Hakuzan Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | 03 /
Tsuji, Ichiroh 5-18-27, Wakaba Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102363.8 | 24.02.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | JP19850036839 | 25.02.1985 Original published format: JP 3683985 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193154 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193154 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193154 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/30, G01N27/40, // G01N33/543 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
G01N33/545 (EP);
G01N7/00 (KR);
G01N33/5438 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/36] | Title | German: | Potentialverursachendes Element für einen Immunosensor | [1986/36] | English: | Potential-causing element for immunosensor | [1986/36] | French: | Elément potentiélaire pour un immunosenseur | [1986/36] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.01.1992 | BE | 29.01.1992 | CH | 29.01.1992 | IT | 29.01.1992 | LI | 29.01.1992 | NL | 29.01.1992 | SE | 29.01.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.01.1992 | |
BE | 29.01.1992 | ||
CH | 29.01.1992 | ||
IT | 29.01.1992 | ||
LI | 29.01.1992 | ||
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | AT | 29.01.1992 | |
BE | 29.01.1992 | ||
CH | 29.01.1992 | ||
LI | 29.01.1992 | ||
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/38] | BE | 29.01.1992 | |
CH | 29.01.1992 | ||
LI | 29.01.1992 | ||
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | CH | 29.01.1992 | |
LI | 29.01.1992 | ||
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 29.01.1992 | |
LI | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 29.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2384789 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTICS [US]); | [Y]GB2052046 (TECHNICON INSTR); | [Y]FR2476125 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [Y]US4334880 (MALMROS MARK K) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 130, no. 10, October 1983, pages 2042-2044, Manchester, New Hampshire, US; G. TOURILLON et al.: "Stability of conducting polythiophene and derivatives" |