EP0195280 - Device for tensioning and aligning flexible printing plates on the plate cylinder of a rotary printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeschke, Willi Berghalde 68 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Spiegel, Nikolaus, Dr. Dantestrasse 13 D-6909 Walldorf / DE | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo, et al c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert, et al c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102500.5 | 26.02.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | DE19853510440 | 22.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3510440 | [1986/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0195280 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0195280 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195280 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
B41F27/1231 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einspannen und Ausrichten von biegsamen Druckplatten auf dem Plattenzylinder von Rotationsdruckmaschinen | [1986/39] | English: | Device for tensioning and aligning flexible printing plates on the plate cylinder of a rotary printing machine | [1986/39] | French: | Dispositif pour tendre et aligner un cliché flexible sur le cylindre porte-plaque d'une machine à imprimer rotative | [1986/39] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB448069 (MULTIGRAPH CO); | [Y]GB2101043 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]); | [E]DE3505678 (BOSSE ROLF DR ING); | [A]US1765530 (HARROLD CHARLES W); | [A]DE946901 (STEINMESSE & STOLLBERG K G) |